Financial history MORPETH AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity number: 1025467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £2.36k £4.77k £4.63k £33 £4.52k
Total expenditure £850 £153 £140 £149 £149
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A