BURLEY-IN-WHARFEDALE SCOUT AND GUIDE GROUP

Charity Number: 1025482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Activities include all aspects of Scouting and Guiding for children between 6 - 18 and encourages and ensures that they all work and help in the local community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £40,458
Total expenditure: £29,405

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 August 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 1ST BURLEY IN WHARFEDALE SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN SPENCER Chair 16 June 2016
None on record
Darren John Hewett Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
HOWARD HENRY THOMPSON Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Beryl Marjorie Thompson Trustee 31 October 2017
None on record
Michael Wild Trustee 16 June 2016
None on record
MICHAEL ROBINSON Trustee 16 June 2016
None on record
Helen Haskins Trustee 25 June 2015
None on record
Sue Vint Trustee 25 June 2015
None on record
MR ROB PAWSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £81.58k £40.14k £48.49k £42.91k £40.46k
Total expenditure £134.45k £22.46k £40.07k £36.75k £29.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £12.34k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.32k £12.34k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
33 Rombalds View
Ilkley
LS29 8LT
Phone:
07969740950
Email:
No information available