Accounts and annual returns VICTORIA PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1025492
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 16 August 2024 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 16 August 2024 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 12 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 12 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 12 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 12 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 11 August 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 25 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window