Financial history VICTORIA PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1025492
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £81.66k £113.13k £98.02k £89.15k £75.85k
Total expenditure £94.77k £92.99k £90.69k £98.10k £87.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £80.69k £77.01k £73.45k £61.70k