Financial history THE ALPHA COMMON INVESTMENT FUND FOR ENDOWMENTS

Charity number: 1025527
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £41.06m £41.68m £47.42m £55.93m £58.19m
Total expenditure £10.74m £51.36m £53.76m £60.61m £72.29m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A