HOSPITAL KOSHER MEALS SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HKMS supplies subsidised frozen kosher meals to hospitals and nursing homes throughout the Greater London area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 September 1993: Standard registration
- HKMS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL GERALD FREEDMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||
Yitzchak Sonnenberg | Trustee | 06 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
JULIAN JUDAH SCHARFER | Trustee | 06 March 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
GRAHAM STUART CALVERT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £835.74k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £776.10k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £223.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £164 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £610.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £770.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 322 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 2 AUGUST 1993
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PROMOTION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ORTHODOX TENETS OF THE JEWISH RELIGION AMONG PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND AMENITIES TO ENABLE THE BENEFICIARIES TO OBSERVE THE REQUIREMENTS OF THE JEWISH DIETARY LAW IN HOSPITALS. ( 2. THE PROVISION OF KOSHER MEALS FOR ELIGIBLE PERSONS IN HOSPITAL, ELIGIBLE PERSONS MEANING PERSONS OF JEWISH FAITH WHO ARE BY REASON OF AGE OR ACCIDENT, SICKNESS OR OTHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY OR BY REASON OF POVERTY UNABLE TO OBTAIN KOSHER MEALS SUFFICIENT FOR THE PROPER NOURISHMENT OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Golders Green Beth Hamedrash
The Riding
LONDON
NW11 8HL
- Phone:
- 02087952058
- Email:
- info@hkms.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window