Financial history INNER WHEEL CLUB OF FROME BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1025602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.35k £85 £16.06k £49.08k £4.86k
Total expenditure £3.25k £355 £17.51k £39.36k £4.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A