TAUNTON DEANE HORTICULTURAL AND FLORICULTURAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Other Defined Groups
- Somerset
Governance
- 01 September 1993: Standard registration
- 04 January 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 January 2005: Funds transferred to 1103853 TAUNTON DEANE HORTICULTURAL AND FLORICULTURAL SOCI...
- TAUNTON FLOWER SHOW (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 11TH DECEMBER 1992, AMENDED 1 DECEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF TAUNTON DEANE BY THE HOLDING OF AN ANNUAL SHOW FOR THE EXHIBITION OF FLOWERS, FRUIT AND VEGETABLES AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE GENERAL COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF TAUNTON DEANE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window