DIVINE REDEEMERS CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious Services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 02 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HANNAH SAYCE | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSINA KWAO-ASIAW | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
FELIX AKINSEYE | Trustee | 03 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA SPENCER | Trustee | 03 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.95k | £9.14k | £8.65k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.85k | £8.45k | £8.17k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 April 2023 | 316 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 08 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST JULY 1993.
Charitable objects
1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE INCLUDING VIDEO AND AUDIO RECORDINGS OR TAPES AND BY ANY OTHER MEDIA WHICH IS OR MAY BECOME AVAILABLE. 2.THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. 3.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISIONS OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND IF THE TRUSTEES SO DECIDE THE PROVISION OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, NORTH LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Divine Redeemers Church
1042-1050 Harrow Road
London
NW10 5NL
- Phone:
- 07939212477
- Email:
- fhesse@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window