EXMOUTH BEACH RESCUE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Exmouth Beach Rescue provides voluntary lifeguard cover to Exmouth beach at weekends and bank holidays throughout the summer season (May bank holiday to end of September). Members are provided with training in rescue & first aid techniques as well as use & maintanence of rescue equipment (including IRB rescue craft). Safety cover also provided for water events (i.e. swimming events & triathlon).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 03 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Hoppins | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|||||
NIGEL SNOWSHALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN TAYLOR-BASHFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.61k | £24.89k | £17.26k | £15.52k | £15.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.16k | £24.18k | £8.29k | £25.12k | £14.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.75k | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 AUGUST 1993
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION AND REDUCTION OF LOSS OF LIFE ON EXMOUTH BEACH OR AREAS AGREED WITH THE DISTRICT COUNCIL
Area of benefit
EXMOUTH BEACH OR AREAS AGREED WITH THE DISTRICT COUNCIL
Contact information
- Address:
-
86 Brixington Lane
EXMOUTH
EX8 4JQ
- Phone:
- 01395743528
- Email:
- exmouthbeachrescue@gmail.com
- Website:
-
exmouthbeachrescueclub.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window