Trustees GOSFORTH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1025695

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DULCIE GWENDA LAIRD | Chair | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
KAREN BERNADETTE RUSS | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Margaret Warmoth | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE GIGG | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
CAROL ANN GREGORY | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ADRIANNE SARAH MILLARD | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Mckenzie | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.