2ND DAVENTRY (DAVENTRY SCHOOL) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 09 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Butcher | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
IRENE LOCKLEY | Trustee | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.35k | £9.37k | £11.18k | £13.68k | £16.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.30k | £9.71k | £10.39k | £9.34k | £4.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 832 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHEIVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL,INTELECTUAL,SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS,AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL,NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout Hall
Northern Wany
Daventry
Northants
NN11 0PE
- Phone:
- 07400568575
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window