Financial history SQUIRRELS CORNER PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1025758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £182.22k £175.23k £163.60k £194.57k £267.82k
Total expenditure £163.62k £168.17k £192.40k £190.23k £236.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £148.88k N/A £169.38k £253.80k