Financial history BLEASBY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1025761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £4.43k £447 £3.43k £4.04k £2.03k
Total expenditure £4.44k £901 £2.45k £4.27k £3.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A