Accounts and annual returns LEVEN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1025777
Charity reporting is up to date (103 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 August 2023 17 September 2024 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 August 2023 17 September 2024 103 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 August 2022 10 July 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 August 2022 10 July 2023 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 August 2020 19 July 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 August 2020 19 July 2021 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 August 2019 28 June 2020 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 August 2019 28 June 2020 22 days late Download Open in new window