CRAWSHAY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school for children aged 2.5-5 years. Following early years foundation stage curriculum. Learning through play inside and out. All staff have first aid training and staff qualification levels include unqualified, NVQ level 3, degree level and Early Years Teacher status. We are accessible to children and families from all areas of the local community regardless of ethnic origin and ability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Reading
Governance
- 13 September 1993: Standard registration
- 14 May 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 14 May 2025: Funds transferred to 294802 WESTWOOD FARM COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
- 14 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1114118 MICKLANDS PRE-SCHOOL
- 14 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1020175 VICTORIA ROAD PRE-SCHOOL
- 14 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1104654 CRESCENT UNDER FIVES
- 14 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1000774 THE GRANGE PLAYGROUP ASSOCIATION
- 14 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1140731 READING YMCA
- 14 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1087387 EMMER GREEN PRE-SCHOOL
- CRAWSHAY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.17k | £101.64k | £89.92k | £58.11k | £20 | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.46k | £82.56k | £92.44k | £126.21k | £10.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £89.60k | £71.86k | £70.28k | £52.29k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 February 2022 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 February 2022 | 218 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window