HAMILTON PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HAMILTONS IS A PRESCHOOL OFFERING OFSTED EARLY YEARS EDUCATION AND FUN THROUGH PLAY FOR 3 AND 4 YEAR OLDS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 09 September 1993: Standard registration
- 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- HAMILTON PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | 31/07/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.41k | £27.82k | £52.04k | £63.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.09k | £35.28k | £53.64k | £62.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 26 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 06 March 2009 | 34 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 19 July 2007 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 19 March 2007 | 47 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JULY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window