Accounts and annual returns TEYNHAM COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1025917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 19 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 19 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 May 2024 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 May 2024 185 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 May 2024 549 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 May 2024 549 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window