Trustees TEYNHAM COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1025917

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Bilton | Chair | 25 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Meader | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Stratton | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Stevens | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Poppy Fossey | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Torrin Murphy | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Brown | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marta Parker | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Samworth | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Owens | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.