WHITEHALL UNDER-FIVES PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CARE AND EDUCATION OF 2 TO 4 YEAR OLD CHILDREN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Total income includes £13,106 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 28 September 1993: Standard registration
- 09 August 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 April 2012: Re-registered
- 11 May 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- WHITEHALL UNDER-FIVES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.62k | £26.12k | £27.82k | £34.28k | £22.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.03k | £24.17k | £28.03k | £31.69k | £32.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £16.25k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £26.81k | £13.11k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 1991 AND AMENDED 14 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window