Financial history Berkshire Deaf Children's Society

Charity number: 1025966
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.09k £5.26k £3.90k £1.78k £11.00k
Total expenditure £10.12k £6.77k £9.16k £9.82k £8.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.00k