Financial history NANAKSAR THATH ISHER DARBAR TRUST

Charity number: 1025988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.19m £1.49m £3.34m £792.28k £830.05k
Total expenditure £507.12k £340.69k £3.66m £541.23k £616.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.07k £19.40k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.08m £1.09m £3.22m £554.70k £818.85k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £111.75k £402.94k £116.34k £58.32k £11.20k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £554.70k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £388.69k £340.69k £3.66m £370.77k £457.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds £118.42k £0 £0 £170.46k £158.65k
Expenditure - Governance £237.72k £181.40k £48.61k £0 £65.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0