PORTLAND UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity Number: 1026000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

YOUTH ORGANISATION FOR 10 TO 18 YR OLDS WHO RECIEVE TRAINING BASED ALONG THE THE STRUCTURE OF THE ROYAL NAVY.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £94,576
Total expenditure: £52,586

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 September 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • T S PENN (Working name)
  • PORTLAND SEA CADER UNIT TS PENN (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOSEPHINE BUTCHER Chair 30 April 2018
None on record
ROBERT FEATHERSTONE Trustee 15 June 2022
ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION PORTLAND BRANCH
Received: On time
Elizabeth Jane Hurst Trustee 05 May 2021
THE ISLAND OF PORTLAND HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
Garry Robert Hepworth Trustee 05 May 2021
None on record
Victoria Louch Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record
Bernadette Cranny Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
William Reeves Trustee 30 March 2018
None on record
Vicky French Trustee 08 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.00k £20.41k £21.58k £13.02k £94.58k
Total expenditure £17.00k £11.43k £6.25k £6.15k £52.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £12.10k £450 £15.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 Weston Park Homes
Weston
PORTLAND
Dorset
DT5 2DE
Phone:
01305 822305
Website:

No information available