Trustees PORTLAND UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 1026000
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPHINE BUTCHER | Chair | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Leonard Featherstone | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Garry Robert Hepworth | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Hurst | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Victoria Louch | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Butcher | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Cranny | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Reeves | Trustee | 30 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Vicky French | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.