Financial history FRIENDS OF PETERSFIELD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1026003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £16.77k £11.80k £4.49k £7.89k £3.28k
Total expenditure £10.08k £17.49k £6.21k £5.25k £5.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A