ALVELEY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of property owned by the Charity. Making Grants within the defined area to reduce need, hardship or distress or paying for items services or facilities to reduce such need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Shropshire
Governance
- 17 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Potter | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SALLY PAGE | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Tweedie | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Roger Sadler | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Keith Stanton | Trustee | 27 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
DARYL COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.04k | £21.60k | £20.35k | £22.76k | £23.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.06k | £6.49k | £9.28k | £10.25k | £13.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 23 JULY 1993
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF ALVELEY AND ROMSLEY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.(2)THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR WHICH UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS.(3)IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY GRANT RELIEF TO PERSONS OTHERWISE ELIGIBLE THEREFOR WHO ARE RESIDENT IMMEDIATELY OUTSIDE THE SAID PARISHES BUT IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES OUGHT NEVERTHELESS FOR SUFICIENT REASON TO BE TREATED AS IF RESIDENT THEREIN OR WHO ARE LOCATED FOR THETIME BEING WITHIN THOSE PARISHES
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF ALVELEY AND ROMSLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
ADAM HOUSE
BIRMINGHAM ROAD
KIDDERMINSTER
WORCESTERSHIRE
DY10 2SH
- Phone:
- 01562820181
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window