Financial history BARKHAM PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1026028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £69.66k £90.02k £83.63k £68.73k £88.74k
Total expenditure £66.76k £72.19k £71.81k £82.51k £77.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £54.40k £71.87k £64.35k £55.00k £65.99k