BARKHAM PRE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school education for ages 2 years to age 5 years
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £65,990 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wokingham
Governance
- 14 September 1993: Standard registration
- 30 May 2024: Funds received from 1025250 SWALLOWFIELD PRE-SCHOOL
- BARKHAM PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iona Selby | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Joy Grainger | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Arnold | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debby Coyle | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Cook | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Pitcher | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.66k | £90.02k | £83.63k | £68.73k | £88.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.76k | £72.19k | £71.81k | £82.51k | £77.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £54.40k | £71.87k | £64.35k | £55.00k | £65.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOVEMBER 1989 AND AMENDED 18 FEBRUARY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barkham Village Hall
Church Lane
Barkham
WOKINGHAM
Berkshire
RG40 4PL
- Phone:
- 01189 760750
- Email:
- preschoolbarkham@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window