Financial history STURMINSTER MARSHALL PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1026037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £92.33k £87.34k £72.08k £83.85k £115.57k
Total expenditure £84.89k £86.55k £68.56k £72.79k £92.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £56.13k £79.27k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A