STURMINSTER MARSHALL PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School facility for children in the Sturminster Marshall area for children age 1 to 4 years 11 months, especially those expected to attend Sturminster Marshall First School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £79,265 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 14 September 1993: Standard registration
- STURMINSTER MARSHALL PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- STURMINSTER MARSHALL PLAYGROUP AND TODDLER GROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Damien Watt | Chair | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Emily Beaves | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Howard | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Cox | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Bullock | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jan Ladbrook | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nina Charman | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.33k | £87.34k | £72.08k | £83.85k | £115.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.89k | £86.55k | £68.56k | £72.79k | £92.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £56.13k | £79.27k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DOPTED 23 FEBRUARY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHIDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
STURMINSTER MARSHALL PRE SCHOOL
Rear Of 78
High Street
Sturminster Marshall
WIMBORNE
Dorset
- Phone:
- 01258858395
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window