Financial history CODFORD CATERPILLARS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1026038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £52.91k £46.85k £70.60k £84.12k £90.62k
Total expenditure £59.96k £58.30k £62.69k £75.79k £95.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.14k £46.92k N/A N/A