CODFORD CATERPILLARS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school playgroup providing activities for 2 -4 year old children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 14 September 1993: Standard registration
- CODFORD PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Davies | Chair | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Sloan | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Blake | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa-Marie Long | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mounde | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Riches | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Allison | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Muckley-Stokes | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.91k | £46.85k | £70.60k | £84.12k | £90.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.96k | £58.30k | £62.69k | £75.79k | £95.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.14k | £46.92k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 FEBRUARY 2003, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14 AUGUST 2003. as amended on 26 Jun 2018 as amended on 26 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
To enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Codford Caterpillars
Cherry Orchard
Codford
Wiltshire
BA12 0PN
- Phone:
- 01985851030
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window