Trustees CODFORD CATERPILLARS PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1026038

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Davies | Chair | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Sloan | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Blake | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa-Marie Long | Trustee | 29 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mounde | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Riches | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Allison | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Muckley-Stokes | Trustee | 12 December 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.