THORLEY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School for rising 3's to rising 5's.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 June 2015
Total income includes £67,150 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 14 September 1993: Standard registration
- 26 January 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 26 January 2016: Funds transferred to 1158322 THORLEY PRE-SCHOOL
- THORLEY CHRISTIAN CENTRE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- THORLEY CHRISTIAN CENTRE PRESCHOOL (Previous name)
- THORLEY CHRISTIAN CENTRE PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- THORLEY PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 11/06/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.17k | £122.22k | £119.76k | £124.66k | £93.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.18k | £108.19k | £115.38k | £120.04k | £87.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £67.15k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 June 2015 | 13 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 June 2015 | 13 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 12 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2014
(These accounts |
12 February 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 14 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 14 May 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 29 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 29 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/05/1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window