UPOTTERY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE FUNDRAISE TO PROVIDE SPORTS & PLAY EQUIPMENT FOR THE SCHOOL & MAINTAIN THE SWIMMING POOL. WE BUY GIFTS FOR THE YEAR 6 LEAVERS & ARE CURRENTLY FUNDRAISING TOWARDS THE REFURBISHMENT OF OUR SCHOOL LIBRARY. WE PAY FOR ALL TRANSPORT FOR SCHOOL TRIPS. WE RECENTLY FUNDED AN OUTDOOR LEARNING SHELTER. WE HAVE ALSO PURCHASED TABLETS, LAPTOPS & LAPTOP CHARGING TROLLEY FOR THE SCHOOL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 22 September 1993: Standard registration
- 09 September 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 June 2017: Re-registered
- UPOTTERY COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT, TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Crabb | Chair | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Burdge | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Tucker | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.48k | £3.50k | £4.71k | £7.68k | £10.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.50k | £2.60k | £5.49k | £6.97k | £3.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED 25 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Upottery Primary School
Upottery
HONITON
EX14 9QT
- Phone:
- 01404861292
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window