Accounts and annual returns BELMONT COMMUNITY CENTRE PRE SCHOOL PLAY GROUP (BURNLEY)

Charity Number: 1026068
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2011 05 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2010 29 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2009 18 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2008 01 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not Required