Accounts and annual returns LOCKING PRE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1026087
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 15 February 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 November 2023 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 22 November 2023 145 days late
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 October 2023 488 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 31 October 2023 488 days late
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 February 2022 241 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 February 2022 241 days late
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 October 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 October 2020 106 days late