Financial history LOCKING PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1026087
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £100.56k £131.86k £130.30k £168.30k £235.57k
Total expenditure £107.75k £126.30k £117.33k £156.91k £216.52k
Income from government contracts £51.52k £93.63k £100.12k £132.36k £190.78k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.65k N/A N/A