HOLYFIRE REVIVAL MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 September 1993: Standard registration
- 18 May 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CROWN ROYALS INTERNATIONAL DISCIPLESHIP STRATEGY ACADEMY (Working name)
- DISCIPLESHIP STRATEGY ACADEMY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 10 March 2005 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 DECEMBER 1992, AMENDED 28 AUGUST 1993
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING : (A) SALVATION AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING TO THOSE WHO HAVE LONG CEASED TO ACCEPT THE REALITY OF GOD'S BLESSINGS IN THEIR LIVES AS WELL AS GUIDANCE OF MEMBERS AND OTHER PERSONS IN THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE (B) CARE AND PRACTICAL HELP TO THE NEEDY E.G. RUNNING BIBLE COURSES, HOLDING PRAYER MEETINGS, VISITING REMAND HOMES, PRISONS AND HOSPITALS (ISAIAH 61:1-11) (C) TO SPREAD THE GOSPEL THROUGH EVANGELISM AND OTHER FORMS OF EDUCATION (E.G. RADIO, TELEVISION, FILM SHOWS, ETC).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window