PENSILVA PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRE-SCHOOL SCHOOL CURRENTLY PROVIDING EDUCATION FOR PRE-SCHOOL AGE CHILDREN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £79,846 from 3 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Cornwall
Governance
- 16 September 1993: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 25 April 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURA JAINE BOND | Chair | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Patricia Quick | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.41k | £95.23k | £87.82k | £100.62k | £100.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.34k | £87.30k | £85.96k | £99.17k | £106.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £70.01k | £78.06k | £71.35k | £75.76k | £79.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2024 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2024 | 362 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 July 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 July 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION 2 AUGUST 2016
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pensilva Preschool
School Road
Pensilva
LISKEARD
Cornwall
PL14 5PG
- Phone:
- 07890 023924
- Website:
-
pensilvapreschool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window