ROBERT MAURICE PURNELL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY: 1. PROMOTION OF SOLO AND COMPOSITE GROUP MUSIC 2. REWARD OUTSTANDING MUSICAL PERFORMANCE AT NORTON HILL SCHOOL DIVIDED INTO TEN SPECIFIC CATEGORIES AS SET OUT IN THE TRUST DEED
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 17 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alun John Williams | Chair | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Selby | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cathie Evans | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Wood | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jessica May Rees | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.48k | £2.64k | £2.25k | £1.52k | £1.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.25k | £2.40k | £115 | £1.94k | £2.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY (1) THE PROMOTION OF SOLO AND COMPOSITE GROUP MUSIC. (2) TO REWARD OUTSTANDING MUSICAL PERFORMANCE AT THE NORTON HILL SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
MIDSOMER NORTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Norton Hill School
Charlton Lane
Misdomer Norton
BA3 4AD
- Phone:
- 01761412557
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window