KENT ADVENTURE CLUB FOR THE DISABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
Governance
- 16 September 1993: Standard registration
- K A C D (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNE MILNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK BEADLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLEN TALLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TRACY BRADD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALBERT FRENCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHARON WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR CAROLINE HOWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZOE RAYFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRY INGRAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERESA HALLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VICKY FITZGERALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 APRIL 1993 AS AMENDED 21 AUGUST 1993
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES RESIDING IN THE NORTH KENT AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS OF SUCH PERSONS IN PARTICULAR THE PROMOTION OF ADVENTURE ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
NORTH KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 JUBILEE CLOSE
STOKE PRIOR
BROMSGROVE
B60 4DG
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window