INNER WHEEL CLUB OF WITNEY BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an Inner Wheel Charity. We collect money at various events and have donated funds to Diabetes UK, Stroke Assoc., Water Aid, Send A Cow, Kids for Kids , Guidepost Trust, Age UK, Shelterbox and similar organisations, These organisations contact us from time to time and our committee makes a judgement as to how much we should give
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 17 September 1993: Standard registration
- INNER WHEEL CLUB & WITNEY BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Elizabeth Ann Simpson | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANNE CRAWFORD | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.06k | £2.39k | £1.80k | £1.81k | £920 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.60k | £1.91k | £2.10k | £1.20k | £2.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MARCH 1968 AS AMENDED 23 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR SUCH CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Coach House
49a Woodgreen
Witney
OX28 1DE
- Phone:
- 01993705485
- Email:
- lizsimpson47@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window