Accounts and annual returns ROWLANDS GILL UNDER FIVES GROUP

Charity Number: 1026149
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 15 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 31 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 22 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 22 May 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 17 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 17 March 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 21 June 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 21 June 2005 On Time