Financial history WHITE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1026169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.74k £6.29k £5.30k £18.01k £0
Total expenditure £3.19k £2.40k £2.61k £310.35k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A