Financial history LONGDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1026177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £15.03k £3.53k £2.32k £5.19k £15.30k
Total expenditure £4.07k £2.48k £3.53k £10.96k £14.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.50k N/A N/A N/A £1.53k