THREE BEARS PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer pre-school sessional care for children from 2 1/2 years old. We are committed to excellence in providing quality care and to facilitate pre-school learning through play.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £143,604 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 September 1993: Standard registration
- KESGRAVE THREE BEARS PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalia Horsfield | Chair | 03 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Amy Rose Furniss | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chandra Simone Dickins | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Tree | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Collier | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Allen | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Garnham | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carly Goodall | Trustee | 28 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.62k | £102.29k | £120.51k | £125.49k | £172.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.73k | £115.17k | £120.71k | £132.59k | £158.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £88.15k | £86.50k | £102.13k | £98.73k | £143.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED 10 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE KESGRAVE (SUFFOLK) AND SURROUNDING VILLAGES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THREE BEARS PLAYGROUP
WILKINSON DRIVE
KESGRAVE
IPSWICH
IP5 2ES
- Phone:
- 01473635255
- Email:
- 3bearskesgrave@gmail.com
- Website:
-
threebearsplaygroup.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window