Financial history LONGWICK PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1026259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £90.69k £108.04k £134.90k £161.39k £200.12k
Total expenditure £84.93k £105.67k £135.22k £173.19k £185.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £81.77k £74.13k £97.27k £132.54k N/A