Accounts and annual returns HIGH LITTLETON PRE-SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1026266
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 19 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 February 2022 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 10 February 2022 255 days late
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 November 2020 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 05 November 2020 158 days late