Financial history HIGH LITTLETON PRE-SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1026266
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £88.79k £99.00k £99.26k £110.68k £88.27k
Total expenditure £81.15k £97.00k £95.70k £111.51k £114.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £80.58k £88.89k N/A
Income from government grants £73.60k £73.00k N/A N/A N/A